VA SB127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Chesapeake; director of audit services. Provides that the director of audit services for the City of Chesapeake shall be known as the City Auditor, shall be chosen solely on the basis of professional qualifications, and shall serve at the pleasure of the city council. This bill is identical to HB 756.
Title
Chesapeake, City of; amending charter, director of audit services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 174 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB127ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100761D |