VA SB1269 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Tabled in Appropriations (11-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Auxiliary grants; independent community living. Allows the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to provide auxiliary grants to eligible recipients residing in independent community living, as defined in the bill, under conditions set forth in the bill. The bill directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to, if deemed necessary, amend the state plan for medical assistance services and any waivers thereof to implement the provisions of the bill and limits to no more than 200 the number of auxiliary grant recipients in independent community living. The bill contains a reenactment clause and directs the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to develop and report to the General Assembly an implementation plan for expanding the auxiliary grants program to recipients residing in independent community living. Auxiliary grants; independent community living. Allows the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to provide auxiliary grants to eligible recipients residing in independent community living, as defined in the bill, under conditions set forth in the bill. The bill directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to, if deemed necessary, amend the state plan for medical assistance services and any waivers thereof to implement the provisions of the bill and limits to no more than 200 the number of auxiliary grant recipients in independent community living. The bill contains a reenactment clause and directs the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to develop and report to the General Assembly an implementation plan for expanding the auxiliary grants program to recipients residing in independent community living.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auxiliary grants; independent community living, report, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseTabled in Appropriations (11-Y 10-N)
2023-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 23106575D-H1
2023-02-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1269S1
2023-01-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105250D-S1
2023-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-26SenateRead second time
2023-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105250D-S1
2023-01-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104050D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515160(n/a)See Bill Text
515160.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1269
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1269+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1269S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1269H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105250D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106575D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1269F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1269FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1269FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0065+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0112SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0129SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0204+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0214+SB1269

Bill Comments

feedback