VA SB1268 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Localities; public hearings for tax rate increases. Authorizes localities to hold hearings on tax rate increases at the same time as the annual budget hearing. Current law requires a hearing on a tax rate increase to occur at a separate proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Localities; public hearings for tax rate increases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21HouseLeft in Finance
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-02-03HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2017-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 3-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101095D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813321(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback