VA SB1268 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement; bond requirements; escrow payments by certain manufacturers. Requires that the bond posted by manufacturers for inclusion in the Directory be equal to the greater of $50,000 or the escrow amount the manufacturer was required to deposit based on its highest calendar year's sales in Virginia. Under current law, the bond amount to be posted is the greater of $50,000 or the escrow amount the manufacturer was required to deposit based on its previous calendar year's sales in Virginia. The bill also adds nonparticipating manufacturers that have been designated by the Attorney General as an elevated risk to the list of those manufacturers that may be required to make escrow payments on a quarterly rather than an annual basis.
Title
Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement; bond requirements and escrow payments by certain manufacturers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1268ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103868D |