VA SB1265 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Veterans Services; Virginia War Memorial division. Provides that only the names and homes of record designation of those Virginians "Killed in Action" (i) as a result of military operations against terrorism, (ii) as a result of a terrorist act, or (iii) in any armed conflict after December 6, 1941, can be placed on the Shrine of Memory on the grounds of the Virginia War Memorial. The names and homes of record designation of all Virginians "Missing in Action" as a result of the Vietnam War and all other Virginians who served honorably but do not meet the criteria for placement on the Shrine of Memory, are required to be honored elsewhere at the Virginia War Memorial. The bill also provides that the Board of Veterans Services will advise the Department of Veterans Services on policies related to the War Memorial. This advisory authority currently rests with the Virginia War Memorial Board. This bill is identical to HB 2672.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia War Memorial; names and homes of Virginians on Shrine of Memory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1265ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateRead first time
2019-02-04SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102220D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222001.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1265
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1265+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1265ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0318+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0095+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0444SB1265+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0446SB1265+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0445SB1265+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0250+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2938+SB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2981+SB1265

Bill Comments

feedback