VA SB1265 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; maintenance of property records; notification when deed, lease, or other agreement to terminate. Requires the Department of General Services to maintain records relating to all property interests held by the Commonwealth and under the control of or occupied by any of its departments, agencies, or institutions, with the exception of records relating to (i) real estate or rights-of-way acquired by the Department of Transportation for the construction of highways; (ii) ungranted shores of the sea, marsh, and meadowlands as defined in ยง 28.2-1500; or (iii) real estate or rights-of-way acquired by the Department of Rail and Public Transportation for the construction of railway lines or rail or public transportation facilities or the retention of rail corridors for public purposes. The bill also provides for the Department to submit a quarterly report, in electronic form, to the General Assembly that includes renewal and termination dates for inventoried property pursuant to the lease, license, permit, or other agreement administered by the Department. The information will include property that serves as a branch office of a state agency and all renewals and terminations scheduled to occur within 90 days of the report date.
Title
General Services, Department of; maintenance of property records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 706 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1265ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1265S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104870D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104870D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100255D |