VA SB1264 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-25 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-25 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that a seller may be held liable for violations of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act that are committed by a third-party telemarketer under common law principles of agency when the third-party telemarketer initiates telephone solicitation calls on behalf of or for the benefit of the seller. A seller shall not be held liable if the third-party telemarketer fails to follow its contractual obligations with the seller or fails to adhere to any guidelines, directions, practices, or policies of the seller for conducting telephone solicitations and communications. The measure defines "seller" as any entity that benefits from the sale of property or services marketed by a telephone solicitation call, including an entity that engages in the marketing or selling of names or data containing the identity of potential customers or sales leads. The measure also provides that a telephone solicitation call includes a telephone call made to a wireless phone registered to any natural person who is a resident of the Commonwealth if the purpose of the telephone call is the offering or advertising of any goods or services for sale, lease, license, or investment, including the offering or advertising of an extension of credit.
Title
Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act; unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101789D-E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1264E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101789D |