VA SB1263 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic regulations; bicycles. Permits operators of bicycles to treat a stop sign as a yield sign in certain situations. The bill requires the driver of a motor vehicle to change lanes when overtaking a bicycle or certain other vehicles when the lane of travel is not wide enough for the overtaking motor vehicle to pass at least three feet to the left of the overtaken vehicle. The bill also removes the limitations on riding bicycles and certain other vehicles two abreast.
Title
Bicycles; permits operators to treat a stop sign as a yield sign in certain situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 22-N) (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 22-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101348D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 839 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 903.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |