VA SB1262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liability of sanctuary cities for certain injuries and damages. Provides that a sanctuary city, defined in the bill as any locality that adopts any ordinance, procedure, or policy that intentionally restricts the enforcement of federal immigration laws to less than the full extent permitted by federal law, shall be jointly and severally liable for the tortious injury to persons or property caused by an illegal alien within such locality.
Title
Sanctuary cities; liability for certain injuries and damages caused by an illegal alien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101859D-E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1262E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (7-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101859D |