VA SB126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Driver education programs; parent/student driver education component. Permits any school division outside Planning District 8, at the discretion of the local school board, to administer a parent/student driver education component as part of the driver education curriculum. Under both current law and the bill, such component is a requirement in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia). The bill allows for school divisions outside Planning District 8 to administer such component in-person or online.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver education programs; parent/student driver education component.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB126ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with amendments (95-Y 4-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-05HouseAmendment by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to
2018-03-05HouseAmendments by Delegate Bulova agreed to
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB126S1
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105453D-S1
2018-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-29SenateRead second time
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105453D-S1
2018-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2017-12-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-12-19SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102499D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221205(n/a)See Bill Text
4621702(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB126
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB126+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB126S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB126ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0521+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0065+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0162SB0126+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0206SB0126+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0902V0042+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0177+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1273+SB0126
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0944SB0126+SB0126

Bill Comments

feedback