VA SB1258 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Solar Energy Development and Energy Storage Authority. Continues the Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority and renames it the Virginia Solar Energy Development and Energy Storage Authority. The measure expands the purposes of the authority to include positioning the Commonwealth as a leader in research, development, commercialization, manufacturing, and deployment of energy storage technology. The powers of the Authority are expanded to include (i) promoting collaborative efforts among Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education in research, development, and commercialization efforts related to energy storage; (ii) monitoring relevant developments nationally and globally; and (iii) identifying and working with the Commonwealth's industries and nonprofit partners. The size of the Authority is expanded from 11 to 15 members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Solar Energy Development and Energy Storage Authority; increases membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 20-N 2-A) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 7-N 2-A) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1258ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 10-N 1-A)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (86-Y 10-N 1-A)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-03-03SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-23 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-23SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17
2017-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-22SenateSigned by President
2017-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1258ER)
2017-02-22SenateEnrolled
2017-02-17HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 20-N 2-A)
2017-02-17HousePassed House (75-Y 20-N 2-A)
2017-02-17HouseRead third time
2017-02-16HouseRead second time
2017-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 3-N)
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenatePassed Senate (30-Y 7-N 2-A)
2017-01-27SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 6-N 2-A)
2017-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 2-N 1-A)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102513D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1258
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1258+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1258ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1258ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0813+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0033+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0122SB1258+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0155SB1258+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0157SB1258+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0158SB1258+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0133+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2451+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1102SB1258+SB1258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2913+SB1258

Bill Comments

feedback