VA SB1257 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Quality. The bill modifies a school personnel requirement in Standard 2 of the Standards of Quality. It requires each school board to provide at least three specialized student support positions, including school social workers, school psychologists, school nurses, licensed behavior analysts, licensed assistant behavior analysts, and other licensed health and behavioral positions, per 1,000 students. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Standards of Quality. The bill modifies a school personnel requirement in Standard 2 of the Standards of Quality. It requires each school board to provide at least three specialized student support positions, including school social workers, school psychologists, school nurses, licensed behavior analysts, licensed assistant behavior analysts, and other licensed health and behavioral positions, per 1,000 students. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOQ; school board to provide at least three specialized student support positions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 21104370D-ES1
2021-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1257ES1
2021-02-05SenateAmendment by Senator McCLellan agreed to
2021-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-05SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1257S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104370D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104370D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health (7-Y 5-N 1-A)
2021-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101061D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221129(n/a)See Bill Text
221199.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:3(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:5(n/a)See Bill Text
221274(n/a)See Bill Text
221274.01:1(n/a)See Bill Text
221294(n/a)See Bill Text
221299.4(n/a)See Bill Text
221303(n/a)See Bill Text
221305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
511617(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1257
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1257+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1257S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1257ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104370D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1257AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1257F122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0080+SB1257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0144+SB1257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1257+SB1257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0337SB1257+SB1257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0338SB1257+SB1257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0339SB1257+SB1257

Bill Comments

feedback