VA SB1257 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters. Adds to the list of persons who are required to report suspected child abuse or neglect ministers, priests, rabbis, imams, and duly accredited practitioners of any religious organization or denomination usually referred to as a church; however, the bill exempts such clergy members from the mandatory reporting requirement when the information supporting the suspicion of child abuse or neglect (i) is required by the doctrine of the religious organization or denomination to be kept confidential or (ii) would be subject to the exemptions set forth in ?§8.01-400 or 19.2-271.3 if offered as evidence in court. This bill is identical to HB 1659.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 295 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1257ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100850D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1257E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100850D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1257
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1257+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1257E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1257ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0295+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0033+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0144+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1257+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1257+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0190+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2705+SB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0678SB1257+SB1257

Bill Comments

feedback