VA SB1255 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Smartchart Network Program. Renames the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program as the Smartchart Network Program and expands the Program to allow participation by all health care providers, insurance carriers, and other organizations with a treatment, payment, or operations relationship with a patient in the Commonwealth to facilitate real-time communication and collaboration. Under current law, participation is limited to hospital emergency departments. The bill makes several other modifications to the Program, including adding a requirement that the Program allow health care providers, health care entities, and insurance carriers to access information necessary to evaluate and monitor the care and treatment of a patient in accordance with applicable patient privacy and security requirements and adding a requirement that such entities continue to improve care coordination in hospital emergency departments in order to reduce the frequency of visits by high-volume emergency department utilizers. The bill also directs the State Health Commissioner and the Director of the Department of Health Professions to convene a work group to study and establish a plan to develop and implement a system to share information regarding a patient's prescription history and medication reconciliation. The bill requires the Commissioner and the Director to report their findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Joint Commission on Health Care, Senate Committee on Education and Health, and House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions by October 1, 2023. The provisions of the bill other than creation of the work group have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024.
Title
Smartchart Network Program; renames Emergency Department Care Coordination Program, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective - see bill) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1255ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 23107331D-S2 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Head, Wampler, Hope |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, McPike, Boysko |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions amendments agreed to |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1255S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105847D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105847D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103954D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2345 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
HB2345 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
HB2345 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Health
Professional and Occupational Regulation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Health
Professional and Occupational Regulation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3705.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 372 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |