VA SB1254 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Sports betting; technical amendments. Clarifies the types of events on which sports betting is allowed. The bill clarifies that a permit issued to a casino operator shall not count toward the maximum of 12 permits that the Director of the Virginia Lottery can issue and makes technical amendments related to the interaction between sports betting law and casino gaming law. Sports betting; technical amendments. Clarifies the types of events on which sports betting is allowed. The bill clarifies that a permit issued to a casino operator shall not count toward the maximum of 12 permits that the Director of the Virginia Lottery can issue and makes technical amendments related to the interaction between sports betting law and casino gaming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports betting; clarifies certain procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1254S1
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103733D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103733D-S1
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100962D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5814030(n/a)See Bill Text
5814031(n/a)See Bill Text
5814032(n/a)See Bill Text
5814039(n/a)See Bill Text
5814100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback