VA SB1253 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1253

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Funds for access roads to economic development sites; criteria for use of funds. Directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board, in consultation with the Secretaries of Transportation and Commerce and Trade, to develop criteria to be used in the award of funds for access roads to economic development sites. The criteria shall take into account job creation, capital investment, and other relevant economic development considerations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access roads to economic development sites; criteria for use of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
2021-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 378 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1253ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100973D

Same As/Similar To

SB1253 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1253
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1253+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1253ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0378+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1253F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1253FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0008+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0100SB1253+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0143SB1253+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1901V0004+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19V0008+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19V0013+SB1253
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1752+SB1253

Bill Comments 750

feedback