VA SB1253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Funds for access roads to economic development sites; criteria for use of funds. Directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board, in consultation with the Secretaries of Transportation and Commerce and Trade, to develop criteria to be used in the award of funds for access roads to economic development sites. The criteria shall take into account job creation, capital investment, and other relevant economic development considerations.
Title
Access roads to economic development sites; criteria for use of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100973D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1253 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote