VA SB1251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Interstate Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Interstate Compact. The compact establishes a state safety oversight authority for the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) Rail System, pursuant to the mandate of federal law, to review, approve, oversee, and enforce the safety of the WMATA Rail System. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Interstate Compact; definitions, Board of Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 3/24/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1251ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Emergency clause added by conference committee | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: LeMunyon, Hugo, Plum |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Barker, DeSteph, Cosgrove |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2017-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1251H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105345D-H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105345D-H1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1251S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105087D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105087D-S1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102737D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Compacts
Governor
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Washington D.C. Metropolitan Area
Compacts
Governor
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Washington D.C. Metropolitan Area