VA SB1248 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Tabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

MEI Project Approval Commission; board-level gender and diversity requirements. Prohibits the MEI Project Approval Commission from recommending approval of any major employment and investment (MEI) project for a business that does not have and does not commit to maintaining a balanced board of directors based upon gender and racial diversity, such that at least 30 percent of such board of directors consists of women and historically underrepresented groups. The bill requires any business seeking approval of a project to submit a board diversity disclosure and to update such disclosure annually, specifying the number and percentage of diverse directors on the board of such business who self-identify as female or represent a national, racial, ethnic, indigenous, or cultural identity in the country of the business's principal executive offices. MEI Project Approval Commission; board-level gender and diversity requirements. Prohibits the MEI Project Approval Commission from recommending approval of any major employment and investment (MEI) project for a business that does not have and does not commit to maintaining a balanced board of directors based upon gender and racial diversity, such that at least 30 percent of such board of directors consists of women and historically underrepresented groups. The bill requires any business seeking approval of a project to submit a board diversity disclosure and to update such disclosure annually, specifying the number and percentage of diverse directors on the board of such business who self-identify as female or represent a national, racial, ethnic, indigenous, or cultural identity in the country of the business's principal executive offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEI Project Approval Commission; board-level gender and diversity requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - House: Tabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseTabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-02-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1248S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106132D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03SenateReported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
2023-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106132D-S1
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101243D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback