VA SB1248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; competency evaluation; receipt of court order. Requires the appointed evaluator or the director of the community services board, behavioral health authority, or hospital to acknowledge receipt of the court order requiring a competency evaluation to be performed to the clerk of the court on a form developed by the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia as soon as practicable but no later than the close of business on the next business day following receipt of the court order. The bill also provides that if the appointed evaluator or the director of the community services board, behavioral health authority, hospital, or private evaluator is unable to conduct the evaluation, he shall inform the court on the acknowledgment form. Juveniles; competency evaluation; receipt of court order. Requires the appointed evaluator or the director of the community services board, behavioral health authority, or hospital to acknowledge receipt of the court order requiring a competency evaluation to be performed to the clerk of the court on a form developed by the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia as soon as practicable but no later than the close of business on the next business day following receipt of the court order. The bill also provides that if the appointed evaluator or the director of the community services board, behavioral health authority, hospital, or private evaluator is unable to conduct the evaluation, he shall inform the court on the acknowledgment form.
Title
Juveniles; competency evaluation, receipt of court order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101003D-E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1248E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101003D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote