VA SB1248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; deferral; Stafford County. Allows Stafford County, by ordinance, to restrict the deferral of real property taxes authorized under current law to a taxpayer's sole dwelling whose tax levy for 2016 exceeded the tax levy for 2015 by at least 25 percent due to improvements made to adjacent property by Stafford County. The amount of the deferral shall not exceed 95 percent of such excess. This bill is identical to HB 2219.
Title
Real property tax; Stafford County may adopt, by ordinance, to restrict deferral of taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1248ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1248S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104677D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104677D-S1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102942D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Ordinances
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Stafford County
Taxation
Uncodified Legislation
Ordinances
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Stafford County
Taxation
Uncodified Legislation