VA SB1246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; mandatory processing of returned absentee ballots before election day; central absentee voter precinct in the office of the general registrar. Requires certain actions to be taken to process absentee ballots that are returned by mail before election day. The general registrar is required to examine the ballot envelopes to verify completion of the required voter affirmation; mark the pollbook, or the absentee voter applicant list if the pollbook is not available, that the voter has voted; and open the sealed ballot envelopes and insert the ballots in optical scan counting equipment or other secure ballot container without initiating any ballot count totals. Under current law, it is only required that the general registrar undertake at least one such activity before election day. To facilitate this preprocessing, the bill requires a central absentee voter precinct to be established in the office of the general registrar. Additional central absentee voter precincts may be established at the discretion of the governing body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; mandatory processing of returned absentee ballots before election day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1246S1
2021-02-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103760D-S1
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateRead second time
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103760D-S1
2021-01-26SenateIncorporates SB1376 (Saslaw)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100746D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242101(n/a)See Bill Text
242709.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242712(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback