VA SB1245 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Arrest and return of parolee or felon serving a period of postrelease supervision. Directs the circuit court of the sentencing jurisdiction to initiate proceedings against a felon serving a period of postrelease supervision upon a showing of a violation or probable violation of any of the terms or conditions of his release. Under current law, the Chairman or any member of the Parole Board initiates such proceedings.
Title
Parolee or felon; arrest & return when serving a period of postrelease supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 28-N) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-25 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2023-02-25 | Senate | No further action taken |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Adams, L.R., Williams, Delaney |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Morrissey, Boysko |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2023-02-23 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 28-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (68-Y 28-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1245H1 |
2023-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106793D-H1 |
2023-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106793D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103530D |