VA SB1244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; protected voter; foster parents. Adds to the list of protected voters any person who has been approved to be a foster parent pursuant to law. Protected voters are permitted by law to provide on the application for voter registration, in addition to the voter's residence street address, a post office box address located within the Commonwealth, which would be the address included on (i) lists of registered voters and persons who voted, (ii) voter registration records made available for public inspection, and (iii) lists of absentee voter applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; protected voter, foster parents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1244ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103143D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242418(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1244
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1244+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1244ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0342+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0098+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1244+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1244+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1803V0014+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0098+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2937+SB1244
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2980+SB1244

Bill Comments

feedback