VA SB1241 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1241

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Personal injury claim; disclosure of insurance policy limits. Provides that in a civil action for personal injuries sustained from a motor vehicle accident, regardless of the amount of losses sustained by an injured person, an insurance company shall disclose the policy limits of an alleged tortfeasor who has been charged with an offense of driving under the influence within 30 days of a request for such disclosure. Under current law, such disclosure is required only if the alleged tortfeasor is convicted of such an offense. The bill also adds the offense of refusal to submit to a breath or blood test to the list of driving under the influence offenses for which disclosure of the insurance policy limits is required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal injury claim; disclosure of insurance policy limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
2021-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 88 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1241ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-22HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22HouseRead third time
2021-02-19HouseRead second time
2021-02-17HouseReported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2021-02-11HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100784D

Same As/Similar To

SB1241 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801417(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback