VA SB124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for food stamps and TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive food stamp benefits shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a drug-related felony. Under current law, such individuals may not be denied food stamp benefits based on a felony conviction of possession of a controlled substance in violation of § 18.2-250, provided that such person is complying with, or has already complied with, all obligations imposed by the criminal court, is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program, participates in periodic drug screenings, and meets any other obligations as determined by the Department of Social Services. The bill also provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive TANF benefits shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a drug-related felony.
Title
Food stamps and TANF; eligibility, drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 221 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB124ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB124S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105548D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105548D-S1 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB155 (Favola) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101203D |
Same As/Similar To
HB566 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
SB155 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services
SB155 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services