VA SB124 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; school boards and school board employees. Allows any school district to invoke the current exemption from the prohibition against hiring, under certain circumstances, a school district employee who is related to a member of the school board. Current law limits use of the exemption to only those school districts located in Planning Districts 3, 4, 11, 12, 13, and 17. This bill incorporates SB 301, SB 345, SB 763, and SB 764 and is identical to HB 212.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; school boards and school board employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB124ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB124S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107038D-S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB764 (Peake) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB763 (Peake) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB345 (Peake) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB301 (Favola) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107038D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102450D |