VA SB1237 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Senate districts; adjustments. Changes district assignments of census blocks in Albemarle County between Districts 17 and 25 in order to exchange two precincts and to reunite two split precincts. The district population deviations remain at less than two percent from the ideal district population.
Title
Senate districts; adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1237ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House (65-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103323D |