VA SB1236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; equal access; education employee associations. Requires school boards to adopt and implement policies to ensure that employees have equal access to education employee associations. The bill requires (i) the Department of Education to identify each education employee association operating in the Commonwealth and provide a list of such education employee associations to school boards and (ii) school boards to provide to each employee such list of available employee education associations and post such list on the school division website.
Title
Public schools; equal access, education employee associations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 11-N) (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 11-N) (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1236S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105048D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105048D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101538D |