VA SB1235 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1235

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Health; certain communication prohibited. Prohibits any person employed by or who has entered into a contract to provide services on behalf of the Department of Health or a local department of health from initiating communication regarding the following matters with a minor on behalf of the Department or local department of health without the consent of the minor's parent or guardian or person serving in loco parentis: family living and community relationships; the benefits, challenges, responsibilities, and value of marriage for men, women, children, and communities; the value of family relationships; abstinence education; the value of postponing sexual activity; the benefits of adoption as a positive choice in the event of an unwanted pregnancy; human sexuality; human reproduction; the prevention of human trafficking; dating violence, the characteristics of abusive relationships, steps to take to deter sexual assault, the availability of counseling and legal resources, and, in the event of such sexual assault, the importance of immediate medical attention and advice, as well as the requirements of the law; the etiology, prevention, and effects of sexually transmitted diseases; and mental health education and awareness. The bill clarifies that its provisions do not apply to school nurses, physicians, or Department employees or agents who are inquiring about medical conditions, outbreaks, pandemics, or any other declared state of emergency relating to a communicable disease or public health threat. Department of Health; certain communication prohibited. Prohibits any person employed by or who has entered into a contract to provide services on behalf of the Department of Health or a local department of health from initiating communication regarding the following matters with a minor on behalf of the Department or local department of health without the consent of the minor's parent or guardian or person serving in loco parentis: family living and community relationships; the benefits, challenges, responsibilities, and value of marriage for men, women, children, and communities; the value of family relationships; abstinence education; the value of postponing sexual activity; the benefits of adoption as a positive choice in the event of an unwanted pregnancy; human sexuality; human reproduction; the prevention of human trafficking; dating violence, the characteristics of abusive relationships, steps to take to deter sexual assault, the availability of counseling and legal resources, and, in the event of such sexual assault, the importance of immediate medical attention and advice, as well as the requirements of the law; the etiology, prevention, and effects of sexually transmitted diseases; and mental health education and awareness. The bill clarifies that its provisions do not apply to school nurses, physicians, or Department employees or agents who are inquiring about medical conditions, outbreaks, pandemics, or any other declared state of emergency relating to a communicable disease or public health threat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, Department of; certain communication prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseTabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-03SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenatePrinted as reengrossed 21101145D-E2
2021-02-03SenateReengrossed by Senate as amended SB1235E2
2021-02-03SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Peake agreed to
2021-02-03SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-03SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Peake withdrawn
2021-02-03SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-03SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-03SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101145D-E
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1235E
2021-02-01SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
2021-01-22SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101145D

Same As/Similar To

SB1235 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3214.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1235
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1235+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1235E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1235E2+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1235AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1235ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1235F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1235FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1235FE2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0079+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0272SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0275SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0276SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0006+SB1235

Bill Comments 750

feedback