VA SB1234 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1234
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attorneys; applicants for Virginia Bar examination. Allows persons who have completed all degree requirements from a law school not approved by the American Bar Association, including a foreign law school, obtained an LL.M. from a law school approved by the American Bar Association, and been admitted to practice law before the court of last resort in any state or territory of the United States or the District of Columbia to sit for the Virginia Bar examination. Attorneys; applicants for Virginia Bar examination. Allows persons who have completed all degree requirements from a law school not approved by the American Bar Association, including a foreign law school, obtained an LL.M. from a law school approved by the American Bar Association, and been admitted to practice law before the court of last resort in any state or territory of the United States or the District of Columbia to sit for the Virginia Bar examination.
Title
Virginia State Bar examination; foreign applicants, evidence required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 296 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1234ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 21200229D-H1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1234H1 |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200229D-H1 |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200229D-H1 |
2021-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1234S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104012D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104012D-S1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100935D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1234 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote