VA SB1234 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Attorneys; foreign applicants for Virginia Bar examination. Allows persons who have been licensed as an attorney or barrister in a foreign country, obtained an LL.M degree from an accredited law school in the United States, and been admitted to practice law before the court of last resort in any state or territory of the United States or the District of Columbia to sit for the Virginia Bar examination. Attorneys; foreign applicants for Virginia Bar examination. Allows persons who have been licensed as an attorney or barrister in a foreign country, obtained an LL.M degree from an accredited law school in the United States, and been admitted to practice law before the court of last resort in any state or territory of the United States or the District of Columbia to sit for the Virginia Bar examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia State Bar examination; foreign applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-03SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1234S1
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104012D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-03SenateRead second time
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104012D-S1
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100935D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413931(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback