VA SB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Incompetent defendants; capital murder. Provides that when a defendant charged with capital murder is determined to be unrestorably incompetent, the court may order that the defendant receive continued treatment to restore competency provided that hearings be held at yearly intervals for five years and at biennial intervals thereafter, or at any time that the director of the treating facility or his designee submits a competency report to the court that the defendant's competency has been restored. Under current law, hearings are held every six months for an incompetent defendant receiving treatment to restore competency. The bill also provides that no unrestorably incompetent defendant charged with capital murder shall be released except pursuant to a court order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defendants; disposition of unrestorably incompetent, capital murder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
2019-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1231ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19107277D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1231H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107277D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107277D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103597D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192169.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1231
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1231+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1231H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1231ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0797+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0088+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0134SB1231+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0168SB1231+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0165+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0356+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3121+SB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0931SB1231+SB1231

Bill Comments

feedback