VA SB1227 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State plan for medical assistance; payment of medical assistance; 12-month supply of hormonal contraceptives. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance a provision for the payment of medical assistance for the dispensing or furnishing of up to a 12-month supply of hormonal contraceptives at one time for Medicaid and Family Access to Medical Insurance Security (FAMIS) enrollees. The bill prohibits the Department of Medical Assistance Services from imposing any utilization controls or other forms of medical management limiting the supply of hormonal contraceptives that may be dispensed or furnished to an amount less than a 12-month supply. The bill provides that the bill shall not be construed to (i) require a provider to prescribe, dispense, or furnish a 12-month supply of self-administered hormonal contraceptives at one time or (ii) exclude coverage for hormonal contraceptives as prescribed by a prescriber, acting within his scope of practice, for reasons other than contraceptive purposes. State plan for medical assistance; payment of medical assistance; 12-month supply of hormonal contraceptives. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance a provision for the payment of medical assistance for the dispensing or furnishing of up to a 12-month supply of hormonal contraceptives at one time for Medicaid and Family Access to Medical Insurance Security (FAMIS) enrollees. The bill prohibits the Department of Medical Assistance Services from imposing any utilization controls or other forms of medical management limiting the supply of hormonal contraceptives that may be dispensed or furnished to an amount less than a 12-month supply. The bill provides that the bill shall not be construed to (i) require a provider to prescribe, dispense, or furnish a 12-month supply of self-administered hormonal contraceptives at one time or (ii) exclude coverage for hormonal contraceptives as prescribed by a prescriber, acting within his scope of practice, for reasons other than contraceptive purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hormonal contraceptives; payment of medical assistance for 12-month supply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101488D-E
2021-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1227E
2021-01-28SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-28SenateRead second time
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101488D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1227
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1227+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1227E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1227AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103334D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1227F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1227FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0049+SB1227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0047+SB1227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0148SB1227+SB1227
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0172SB1227+SB1227

Bill Comments 750

feedback