VA SB1226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusion for proprietary records and trade secrets; solar energy agreements. Excludes from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA proprietary information, voluntarily provided by a private business under a promise of confidentiality from a public body, used by the public body for a solar services agreement. The bill requires the private business to specify the records for which protection is sought before submitting them to the public body and to state the reasons why protection is necessary. The bill also (i) allows a solar services agreement contractor or provider to designate specific provisions in a solar services agreement as proprietary information not subject to disclosure and (ii) authorizes a city to withhold from disclosure such information provided by a private entity in connection with a franchise, lease, or use under a solar services agreement.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; proprietary records and trade secrets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1226ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title replaced 17105461D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1226H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105461D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105461D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103762D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Consumer Protection
Energy Conservation and Resources
Freedom of Information
Solar Energy
Consumer Protection
Energy Conservation and Resources
Freedom of Information
Solar Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4329.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |