VA SB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective services; adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; multidisciplinary teams. Authorizes local departments of social services to foster, when practicable, the creation, maintenance, and coordination of hospital and community-based multidisciplinary teams focused on the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults 60 years of age or older or 18 years of age or older who are physically or mentally incapacitated. The bill provides that such teams may: (i) assist the local department of social services in identifying abused, neglected, and exploited adults; (ii) coordinate medical, social, and legal services for abused, neglected, and exploited adults and their families; (iii) develop innovative programs for detection and prevention of the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults; (iv) promote community awareness and action to address adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; and (v) disseminate information to the general public regarding the problem of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation, strategies and methods for preventing such abuse, neglect, and exploitation and treatment options for abused, neglected, and exploited adults. The bill also allows the attorney for the Commonwealth in each jurisdiction to establish a multidisciplinary adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation response team to review cases of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults. Such multidisciplinary team may be established separately or in conjunction with any already existing multidisciplinary team. This bill is identical to HB 2560.
Title
Protective services; adult abuse and exploitation, multidisciplinary teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775) | |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1224ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19106573D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1224H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106573D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106573D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1224S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105183D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105183D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103368D |