VA SB1222 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance licensing and continuing education course requirements. Requires the biennial renewal, for individuals and business entities, of licenses by insurance agents, consultants, public adjusters, surplus lines brokers, and viatical settlement brokers by a producer's year and month of birth. The measure also requires fingerprinting for the purpose of conducting state and federal criminal background checks on new resident applicants. The measure establishes fees for processing license renewal applications, requires proof of compliance with continuing education requirements, addresses reinstatement of licenses, and provides for waivers of certain requirements. The measure requires licensed persons to report changes in their name or address. The measure provides that the registration fee for settlement agents will be prescribed by the Commission and that the Commission will retain the authority to enforce these provisions against any person who is under investigation for or charged with a violation. The measure also revises the timeline for completion of insurance continuing education courses to require completion biennially, based on an insurance agent's year and month of birth. The measure modifies the membership of the insurance continuing education board and the criteria for selection by the State Corporation Commission of the same. The measure also includes clarifications and removes obsolete requirements. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021. The bill incorporates SB 1747.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance licensing, biennial; renewal for individuals and business entities, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 675 (effective 1/1/21)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1222ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1222S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105707D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105707D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103129D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
3821819(n/a)See Bill Text
3821820(n/a)See Bill Text
3821824(n/a)See Bill Text
3821825.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821826(n/a)See Bill Text
3821838(n/a)See Bill Text
3821840(n/a)See Bill Text
3821841(n/a)See Bill Text
3821842(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.17(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.22(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.8(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.9(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.3(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.4(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.5(n/a)See Bill Text
3821857.9(n/a)See Bill Text
3821865.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821865.5(n/a)See Bill Text
3821876(n/a)See Bill Text
3821882(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1222
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1222+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1222S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1222ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0675+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0111+SB1222
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1222+SB1222
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1222+SB1222
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1222+SB1222
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0172+SB1222
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2703+SB1222

Bill Comments

feedback