VA SB1219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Bureau of Insurance; paid family leave; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission's Bureau of Insurance (the Bureau) to review and make recommendations, including any necessary statutory and regulatory changes, to authorize the State Corporation Commission to approve the sale of individual and group paid family leave plans in Virginia. The bill requires the Bureau to also identify options and make recommendations for encouraging or incentivizing employers to voluntarily offer up to 12 weeks of paid family leave. The bill requires the Bureau to convene a stakeholder group to participate in the process, which is required to include representatives from the insurance industry and the business community, advocates for paid family leave, and other interested parties. The bill requires the Bureau to report its findings and recommendations to the Senate Committees on Commerce and Labor and Finance and Appropriations and the House Committees on Labor and Commerce and Appropriations by November 30, 2021. Bureau of Insurance; paid family leave; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission's Bureau of Insurance (the Bureau) to review and make recommendations, including any necessary statutory and regulatory changes, to authorize the State Corporation Commission to approve the sale of individual and group paid family leave plans in Virginia. The bill requires the Bureau to also identify options and make recommendations for encouraging or incentivizing employers to voluntarily offer up to 12 weeks of paid family leave. The bill requires the Bureau to convene a stakeholder group to participate in the process, which is required to include representatives from the insurance industry and the business community, advocates for paid family leave, and other interested parties. The bill requires the Bureau to report its findings and recommendations to the Senate Committees on Commerce and Labor and Finance and Appropriations and the House Committees on Labor and Commerce and Appropriations by November 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family leave; SCC's Bureau of Insurance to review and make recommendations, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N)
2021-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101271D-E
2021-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1219E
2021-01-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-21SenateRead second time
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101271D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback