VA SB1219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Board for Contractors; alternate designated employee. Directs the Board for Contractors (Board) to revise Board regulations to allow multiple individuals from a single firm to sit for the business examination required to be confirmed as the firm's designated employee. The bill also directs the Board to review current regulations and procedures pertaining to the time allowed for a change of the designated employee to determine if the current time for replacement is sufficient and practicable.
Title
Contractors, Board for; revision of regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1219ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1219S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105989D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105989D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102858D |