VA SB1218 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; Commonwealth Council on Aging; membership and staff support. Reduces from 24 to 18 the number of members to be appointed to the Commonwealth Council on Aging by (i) replacing the requirement that the membership include one member from each of the 11 congressional districts of the Commonwealth with the requirement that the membership include one member from each of the eight regions of the Commonwealth identified by the University of Virginia's Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service in its Virginia Regional Map (2017); (ii) adding the Executive Director of the Virginia Center on Aging; and (iii) reducing from four to two the number of members to be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates and the Senate Committee on Rules, respectively. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to appoint an executive director to serve as secretary to the Council.
Title
Aging, Commonwealth Council on; membership and staff support.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1218ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1218S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23104662D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23104662D-S1 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103832D |