VA SB1217 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Financial institutions; earned wage access services; stakeholder process; report. Directs the Bureau of Financial Institutions of the State Corporation Commission to convene a stakeholder process regarding the provision or offering of earned wage access services that includes representatives from providers of earned wage access services, consumer advocates, and the Office of the Attorney General. The bill requires the Bureau of Financial Institutions to report its findings and recommendations by November 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned wage access services; the Bureau of SCC to conduct stakeholder process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-25SenateFailed to pass in Senate
2023-02-25SenateNo further action taken
2023-02-23HouseDelegates: Batten, O'Quinn, Sullivan
2023-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2023-02-23SenateSenators: Mason, Lucas, Newman
2023-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2023-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-23HouseHouse requested conference committee
2023-02-23HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2023-02-23SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2023-02-22HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N)
2023-02-22HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 42-N)
2023-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1217H1
2023-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 23106908D-H1
2023-02-22HouseRead third time
2023-02-21HousePassed by for the day
2023-02-20HouseRead second time
2023-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 23106908D-H1
2023-02-16HouseReported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2023-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
2023-02-13HouseAssigned sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1217S1
2023-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106368D-S1
2023-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived 23106368D-S1
2023-02-07SenateRead second time
2023-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106368D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103912D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
622239(n/a)See Bill Text
622260(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1217
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1217+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1217S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1217H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106368D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/23106908D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1217F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1217FS1171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1217FH1171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0082+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0375SB1217+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0376SB1217+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0377SB1217+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H2301V0030+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H23V0160+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2188+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0834SB1217+SB1217
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0902SB1217+SB1217

Bill Comments

feedback