VA SB1216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
All-Payer Claims Database; penalty. Requires the Commissioner of Health, in cooperation with the Bureau of Insurance, to collect health claims data from certain insurers, corporations, managed care organizations, third-party administrators, and any self-funded employee welfare benefit plans (ERISA plans) whose employer has opted-in to the All-Payer Claims Database, the Department of Medical Assistance Services, state government health insurance plans, local government health insurance plans, and federal health insurance plans. The bill provides that employers that maintain an ERISA plan may opt-in to participate in the All-Payer Claims Database and provides a process for such agreement. The bill adds members to the advisory committee to the nonprofit organization that administers the All-Payer Claims Database. The bill requires the Commissioner of Health to establish a data release committee to review and approve requests for access to data and prohibits the release of data without the approval of such committee. The bill requires the nonprofit organization to ensure that data is timely submitted to the All-Payer Claims Database and authorizes the Board of Health to assess a civil penalty on entities not in compliance. This bill is identical to HB 2798.
Title
All-Payer Claims Database; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1216ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-13 | House | Delegates: Garrett, Orrock, James |
2019-02-13 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Dunnavant, Barker |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104454D-ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1216ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104454D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB1735 (Deeds) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104454D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102422D |