VA SB1215 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1215

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition and upon proper evidence presented, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1215ER)
2021-02-22SenateEnrolled
2021-02-18SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N)
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House with amendment (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-16HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2021-02-16HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2021-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102805D-E
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1215E
2021-02-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102805D

Same As/Similar To

SB1215 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
HB1900 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
HB1900 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511243(n/a)See Bill Text
5511243.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1215
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1215+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1215E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1215ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0404+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1215AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200024A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1215AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1215AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1215F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1215FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1215FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0051+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1215+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0241SB1215+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0006+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1601+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0120SB1215+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0129SB1215+SB1215
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0130SB1215+SB1215

Bill Comments

feedback