VA SB1215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition and upon proper evidence presented, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition and upon proper evidence presented, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102805D-E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1215E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102805D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1215 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 1 | 1243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1243.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |