VA SB1214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority; effective date. Repeals the contingent effective date for the creation of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. Such contingency has been met. This bill is a recommendation of the Code Commission.
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority; repeals effective date for creation of Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100062D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote