VA SB1213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0039)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety; threat assessment; case management tool. Requires the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to develop a case management tool for use by public elementary and secondary school threat assessment teams and requires such threat assessment teams to use such tool to collect and report to the Center quantitative data on its activities. HB 1734 is identical.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School and Campus Safety, Virginia Center for; threat assessment, case management tool.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0039)
2019-02-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 39 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1213ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-10SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102329D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22179.4(n/a)See Bill Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1213
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1213+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1213ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0039+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0033+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0099+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1213+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0201SB1213+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0234+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0176+SB1213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2601+SB1213

Bill Comments

feedback