VA SB1212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation. Authorizes the creation of a regional passenger rail station authority in Planning District 4 to assist in the creation and maintenance of passenger rail in the region. The authority would be authorized to enter into revenue sharing agreements and to issue revenue bonds. The authority would be governed by a board consisting of members of each participating locality and institution of higher education. New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation. Authorizes the creation of a regional passenger rail station authority in Planning District 4 to assist in the creation and maintenance of passenger rail in the region. The authority would be authorized to enter into revenue sharing agreements and to issue revenue bonds. The authority would be governed by a board consisting of members of each participating locality and institution of higher education.
Title
New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation of authority in Planning District 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102192D-E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1212E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102192D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1212 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote