VA SB1211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Fund. Imposes an additional $4 vehicle registration fee to be deposited into the Public Safety Trust Fund, established by the bill. The moneys in the Public Safety Trust Fund are to be used to eliminate barriers to an inclusive, diverse, and well-qualified workforce by addressing compensation issues related to staffing, retention, and pay compression at the Department of State Police.
Title
Vehicle registration fees; imposes an additional fee to be deposited into Public Safety Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102719D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1211 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 686 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 694 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 694.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |