VA SB1211 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Gender-specific references. Revises references to certain gender-specific terms in the Code of Virginia in light of the 2014 Bostic v. Rainey decision, 970 F.Supp.2d 456 (E.D. Va. 2014), cert. denied, 83 U.S.L.W. 3189 (U.S. Oct. 6, 2014), which struck down Virginia's ban on same-sex marriage. The bill also makes technical amendments.
Title
Gender-specific references; revisions to certain terms in the Code of Virginia.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103437D |