VA SB1210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental permit fees; working groups. Directs the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to convene working groups for the purpose of developing annual fee schedules for nonhazardous solid waste management facilities and annual maintenance fees for certain water withdrawal permits to replace the current annual fee schedules. Environmental permit fees; working groups. Directs the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to convene working groups for the purpose of developing annual fee schedules for nonhazardous solid waste management facilities and annual maintenance fees for certain water withdrawal permits to replace the current annual fee schedules.
Title
Permit fee schedules; DEQ to revise current schedule for nonhazardous solid waste mgmt. facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1210S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103681D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103681D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101993D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1210 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1402.1:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |